PA HB1361 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 10, 1990 (P.L.404, No.98), known as the Real Estate Appraisers Certification Act, further providing for definitions and for State Board of Certified Real Estate Appraisers.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for State Board of Certified Real Estate Appraisers.
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Harper [R] | Rep. Mary Jo Daley [D] | Rep. Warren Kampf [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] |
Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. William Kortz [D] | Rep. Tina Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1361 PN 1690, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2017-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-20 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |