PA HB1356 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-03 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-03 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, further providing for general powers of the board, for specific subjects on which board may adopt regulations and for Office of Administrative Law Judge; providing for employees of the board; further providing for management of Pennsylvania Liquor Stores; and making a repeal.
Title
Further providing for general powers of the board, for specific subjects on which board may adopt regulations and for Office of Administrative Law Judge; providing for employees of the board; further providing for management of Pennsylvania Liquor Stores; and making a repeal.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D] | Rep. Keith Gillespie [R] | Sen. Thomas Killion [R] | Rep. Ron Miller [R] |
Rep. Thomas Murt [R] | Rep. Thomas Mustio [R] | Rep. Scott Petri [R] | Rep. Kathy Rapp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-11-03 | House | Removed from table |
2011-09-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-09-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-21 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2011-06-21 | House | First consideration |
2011-06-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-04-20 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |