PA HB1348 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 61-4)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for limited civil liability for agritourism activity providers, for notice of limited civil liability and for acknowledgment of limited civil liability.
Title
Providing for limited civil liability for agritourism activity providers, for notice of limited civil liability and for acknowledgment of limited civil liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1348 PN 3056, FP (Y: 120 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1348 PN 2013, 2019 A4264, ECKER (Y: 178 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01614 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1348 PN 2013, 2019 A4264, ECKER (Y: 178 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01614 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2020-11-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-11-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (120-81) |
2020-10-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-13 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-06 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-12-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-12-17 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-12-16 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-05 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-05 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-05 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |