PA HB1336 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school health services, further providing for possession and use of asthma inhalers.
Title
In school health services, further providing for possession and use of asthma inhalers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-22 - House - HB 1336 PN 3389, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - House - HB 1336 PN 2238, 2009 A3866, RAPP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - House - HB 1336 PN 2238, 2009 A3866, RAPP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Referred to EDUCATION | |
2010-03-22 | In the Senate | |
2010-03-22 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-03-17 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2010-03-17 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-09-11 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-09-11 | Removed from table | |
2009-09-10 | Laid on the table | |
2009-09-10 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-22 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-22 | First consideration | |
2009-06-22 | Reported as amended | |
2009-04-22 | Referred to EDUCATION |