PA HB1331 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, providing for public job posting database, for instructional vacancy data and for data transparency; and establishing the Educator Pipeline Support Grant Program.
Title
In preliminary provisions, providing for public job posting database, for instructional vacancy data and for data transparency; and establishing the Educator Pipeline Support Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1331 PN 1653, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 141 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1331 PN 1548, 2023 A1120 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended A00924 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00924 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1331 PN 1653, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 141 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1331 PN 1548, 2023 A1120 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended A00924 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00924 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2023-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (141-62) |
2023-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-21 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2023-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-13 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-06-13 | House | First consideration |
2023-06-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-06-06 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |