PA HB1329 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Act No. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Act No. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring certain hospitals to allow patients an opportunity to designate caregivers in patients' medical records and imposing duties on hospitals.
Title
Requiring certain hospitals to allow patients an opportunity to designate caregivers in patients' medical records and imposing duties on hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1329 PN 2973, CONCUR (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1329 PN 2973, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1329 PN 1883, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A02487 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A02409 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A02409 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A02487 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1329 PN 2973, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1329 PN 1883, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A02487 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A02409 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A02409 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A02487 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Act No. 20 |
2016-04-20 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-04-13 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-04-12 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Signed in House |
2016-04-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (196-0) |
2016-04-12 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-04-11 | House | In the House |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2973 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Amended on second consideration |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2015-11-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2015-06-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-1) |
2015-06-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-29 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-24 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-24 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-06-12 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |