PA HB1319 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-14)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on May 18 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the offense of scattering rubbish, for the acknowledgment of littering provisions at time of application for learner's permit or driver's license and for the offense of depositing of waste and other material on highway, property or waters.
Title
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the offense of scattering rubbish, for the acknowledgment of littering provisions at time of application for learner's permit or driver's license and for the offense of depositing of waste and other material on highway, property or waters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-09-15 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-09-15 | Removed from table | |
2008-09-15 | Laid on the table | |
2008-09-15 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-06-27 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2008-06-27 | First consideration | |
2008-06-27 | Reported as amended | |
2008-01-29 | Re-referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2008-01-29 | Reported with request to re-refer to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2007-05-18 | Referred to JUDICIARY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1319 |