PA HB1313 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-29 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-29 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1988 (P.L.1262, No.156), known as the Local Option Small Games of Chance Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for legislative intent and for definitions; in games of chance, further providing for prize limits and for sales limited, providing for pull-tab deal, further providing for distributor licenses and for major league sports drawing, providing for airport 50/50 drawing, further providing for registration of manufacturers, for regulations of department, for licensing of eligible organizations and for special permits and providing for special location permits, for vertical wheel game permits and for poker run permits; in club licensees, further providing for club licensee, providing for definition and for club licensee, further providing for distribution of proceeds and providing for club licensee location permits; in enforcement, further providing for revocation of licenses and for enforcement; and, in tavern gaming, further providing for definitions, for licenses, for application, for approval, for tavern raffle, for distribution of net revenue, for tavern games tax, for host municipality tavern games tax and for enforcement.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for legislative intent and for definitions; in games of chance, further providing for prize limits and for sales limited, providing for pull-tab deal, further providing for distributor licenses and for major league sports drawing, providing for airport 50/50 drawing, further providing for registration of manufacturers, for regulations of department, for licensing of eligible organizations and for special permits and providing for special location permits, for vertical wheel game permits and for poker run permits; in club licensees, further providing for club licensee, providing for definition and for club licensee, further providing for distribution of proceeds and providing for club licensee location permits; in enforcement, further providing for revocation of licenses and for enforcement; and, in tavern gaming, further providing for definitions, for licenses, for application, for approval, for tavern raffle, for distribution of net revenue, for tavern games tax, for host municipality tavern games tax and for enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Pam Snyder [D] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] |
Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. Kate Klunk [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1313 PN 3927, FP (Y: 167 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1313 PN 3868, 2015 A9828, DELOZIER (Y: 80 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2016-09-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1313 PN 3868, 2015 A9832, PAYNE (Y: 153 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Adopt Amendment A09696 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1313 PN 3868, 2015 A9828, DELOZIER (Y: 80 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2016-09-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1313 PN 3868, 2015 A9832, PAYNE (Y: 153 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Adopt Amendment A09696 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2016-09-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-09-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (167-21) |
2016-09-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-09-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-09-26 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-09-21 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-20 | House | First consideration |
2016-09-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-09-29 | House | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |