PA HB1312 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-11)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 62 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-11)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 62 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 45676, carrying Pennsylvania Route 26 over Yellow Creek in Hopewell Township, Bedford County, as the PFC James E. Williams Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 55863, carrying Pennsylvania Route 26 over Bloody Run in Everett Borough, Bedford County, as the Colonel Joseph M. Stine Memorial Bridge; and designating a portion of Harvey Run Road between State Route 2018 in New Sewickley Township to State Route 1065 in Freedom Borough, Beaver County, as the Army Sergeant Joshua James Rimer Memorial Road; and making related repeals.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 45676, carrying Pennsylvania Route 26 over Yellow Creek in Hopewell Township, Bedford County, as the PFC James E. Williams Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 55863, carrying Pennsylvania Route 26 over Bloody Run in Everett Borough, Bedford County, as the Colonel Joseph M. Stine Memorial Bridge; and designating a portion of Harvey Run Road between State Route 2018 in New Sewickley Township to State Route 1065 in Freedom Borough, Beaver County, as the Army Sergeant Joshua James Rimer Memorial Road; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-07 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1312 PN 3334, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1312 PN 3334, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05234 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1312 PN 1404, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1312 PN 3334, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1312 PN 3334, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05234 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1312 PN 1404, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Act No. 62 of 2022 |
2022-07-11 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-08 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-07-07 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-07 | House | Signed in House |
2022-07-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (199-1) |
2022-07-07 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-07-07 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-07-07 | House | In the House |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Re-committed to TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-10-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-09-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-09-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2021-09-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-27 | House | Second consideration |
2021-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |