PA HB1308 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-19 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-19 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for establishment of death review teams, for duties of death review teams, duties of Department of Health, for confidentiality of death review teams records and for criminal and civil liability protections.
Title
Providing for establishment of death review teams, for duties of death review teams, duties of Department of Health, for confidentiality of death review teams records and for criminal and civil liability protections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1308 PN 2423, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1308 PN 2316, 2021 A3037 (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A02739 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A02714 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1308 PN 2423, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1308 PN 2316, 2021 A3037 (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A02739 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A02714 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-19 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2021-11-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-11-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2021-11-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-10-27 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-26 | House | First consideration |
2021-10-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |