PA HB1303 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-17 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 11 (Cities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in mayor, further providing for execution of laws, powers of sheriff conferred and emergency powers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In mayor, further providing for execution of laws, powers of sheriff conferred and emergency powers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Local Government: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-17HouseLaid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
2023-06-28HouseRe-reported as committed
2023-06-14HouseRe-committed to RULES
2023-06-14HouseFirst consideration
2023-06-14HouseReported as committed
2023-06-05HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback