PA HB129 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, prohibiting eligibility for individuals convicted of drug distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public assistance, prohibiting eligibility for individuals convicted of drug distribution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 129 PN 605, FP (Y: 137 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 129 PN 605, MOT RECON, DERMODY (Y: 191 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 129 PN 605, FP (Y: 137 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-08SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2018-06-05SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-05HouseFinal passage (137-58)
2018-06-05HouseVote on final passage reconsidered (191-4)
2018-06-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (137-59)
2018-06-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-04HouseSecond consideration
2018-05-24HouseRemoved from table
2018-05-22HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-22HouseFirst consideration
2018-05-22HouseReported as committed
2017-02-23HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=129
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0129&pn=0605
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=05/22/2018&RollCallId=1528
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/05/2018&RollCallId=1594
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1270
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1272
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1273

Bill Comments

feedback