PA HB1284 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-6)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 107
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-6)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 107
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the Pennsylvania Business One-Stop Shop within the Department of Community and Economic Development.
Title
Providing for the Pennsylvania Business One-Stop Shop within the Department of Community and Economic Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1284 PN 3816, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1284 PN 3816, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1284 PN 3121, 2017 A8703, SOLOMON (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Commerce: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A05731 (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1284 PN 3816, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1284 PN 3121, 2017 A8703, SOLOMON (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Commerce: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A05731 (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | Senate | Act No. 107 |
2018-10-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-09-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2018-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-22 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-06-11 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-09 | House | Removed from table |
2018-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-12 | House | First consideration |
2018-03-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |