PA HB128 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-12)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in offenses against the family, further providing for the offense of dealing in infant children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In offenses against the family, further providing for the offense of dealing in infant children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 128 PN 94, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-13SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-12SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-12SenateReported as committed
2017-02-15SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-02-07SenateIn the Senate
2017-02-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2017-02-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-02-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-02-06HouseSecond consideration
2017-01-25HouseRemoved from table
2017-01-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-01-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-01-25HouseReported as committed
2017-01-23HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=128
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0128&pn=0094
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=01/25/2017&RollCallId=10
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=27
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/07/2017&RollCallId=55
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/12/2018&RollCallId=931

Bill Comments

feedback