PA HB1274 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Passed on December 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-18 - Act No. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Passed on December 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-18 - Act No. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for criminal laboratory user fee.
Title
Further providing for criminal laboratory user fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-10 - Senate - HB 1274 PN 1637, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-09 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - HB 1274 PN 1637, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-12-09 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - HB 1274 PN 1637, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Senate | Act No. 112 |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Signed in House |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-11-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-11-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-06-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2013-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-18 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |