PA HB126 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
Pending: Senate Urban Affairs & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the First-time Homebuyer Savings Account Program and the First-time Homebuyer Savings Account Program Fund; and imposing duties on the Treasury Department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the First-time Homebuyer Savings Account Program and the First-time Homebuyer Savings Account Program Fund; and imposing duties on the Treasury Department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 126 PN 3434, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 192 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 126 PN 3133, 2023 A5224 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - House Housing And Community Development: Adopt Amendment A04499 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - House Housing And Community Development: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Commerce: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Commerce: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-12SenateReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
2024-06-28SenateIn the Senate
2024-06-28HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-10)
2024-06-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2024-06-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2024-06-27HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2024-06-26HouseRemoved from table
2024-05-21HouseLaid on the table
2024-05-21HouseFirst consideration
2024-05-21HouseReported as amended
2023-05-03HouseRe-referred to HOUSING AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
2023-05-03HouseReported with request to re-refer to HOUSING AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
2023-03-07HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=126
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0126&pn=0109
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0126&pn=3133
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0126&pn=3434
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0126&pn=0109&aYear=2023&an=04499
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0126&pn=3133&aYear=2023&an=05224
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/HB0126P3434.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=05/03/2023&RollCallId=158
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=05/03/2023&RollCallId=157
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=64&theDate=05/21/2024&RollCallId=1766
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=64&theDate=05/21/2024&RollCallId=1765
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1288
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=62&theDate=06/27/2024&RollCallId=2173
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1325

Bill Comments

feedback