PA HB1228 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school health services, providing for sun protection of students, including the application of nonprescription sunscreen.
Title
In school health services, providing for sun protection of students, including the application of nonprescription sunscreen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1228 PN 3299, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1228 PN 3299, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A05955 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1228 PN 3299, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A05955 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | Senate | Act No. 105 |
2018-10-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-09-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2018-04-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-11 | House | Second consideration |
2018-04-10 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-09 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |