PA HB1216 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-16)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-16)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in riot, disorderly conduct and related offenses, further providing for definitions, for the offense of neglect of animal and for the offense of attack of guide dog; in trade and commerce, further providing for the offense of discrimination on account of guide, signal or service dog or other aid animal; and, in particular rights and immunities, providing for rescue from motor vehicle.
Title
In riot, disorderly conduct and related offenses, further providing for definitions, for the offense of neglect of animal and for the offense of attack of guide dog; in trade and commerce, further providing for the offense of discrimination on account of guide, signal or service dog or other aid animal; and, in particular rights and immunities, providing for rescue from motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1216 PN 3819, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1216 PN 3819, CONCUR (Y: 181 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1216 PN 2203, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1216 PN 2166, 2017 A2459, MOT RECON, HARRIS, J. (Y: 95 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1216 PN 2166, 2017 A2552, KNOWLES (Y: 50 N: 149 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1216 PN 2166, 2017 A2459, KNOWLES (Y: 101 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1216 PN 2166, 2017 A2553, P. COSTA (Y: 195 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02306 (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1216 PN 3819, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1216 PN 3819, CONCUR (Y: 181 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1216 PN 2203, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1216 PN 2166, 2017 A2459, MOT RECON, HARRIS, J. (Y: 95 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1216 PN 2166, 2017 A2552, KNOWLES (Y: 50 N: 149 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1216 PN 2166, 2017 A2459, KNOWLES (Y: 101 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1216 PN 2166, 2017 A2553, P. COSTA (Y: 195 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02306 (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Act No. 104 |
2018-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (181-0) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-10-17 | House | In the House |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Motion to revert to Prior Printer's No. 3819 |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-07-14 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-07-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-07-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2017-07-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-30 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-06-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-28 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-28 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-28 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |