PA HB1210 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-6)
Status: Engrossed on July 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-17 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in protection from abuse, further providing for relief, for emergency relief by minor judiciary and for arrest for violation of order.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In protection from abuse, further providing for relief, for emergency relief by minor judiciary and for arrest for violation of order.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-07-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1210 PN 1283, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 130 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-17SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2023-07-06SenateIn the Senate
2023-07-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (130-73)
2023-07-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2023-06-29HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2023-06-29HouseSecond consideration
2023-06-29HouseRe-reported as committed
2023-06-14HouseRe-committed to RULES
2023-06-14HouseFirst consideration
2023-06-14HouseReported as committed
2023-05-19HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1210
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1210&pn=1283
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/HB1210P1283.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=60&theDate=06/14/2023&RollCallId=425
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=67&theDate=06/29/2023&RollCallId=726
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=468
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=62&theDate=07/06/2023&RollCallId=762

Bill Comments

feedback