PA HB1201 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in the Secretary of the Commonwealth, further providing for powers and duties of the Secretary of the Commonwealth and for explanation of ballot question and providing for wording of ballot question; in dates of elections and primaries and special elections, further providing for elections on proposed constitutional amendments; in ballots, further providing for form of official election ballot; in voting machines, further providing for form of ballot labels on voting machines; and, in preparation for and conduct of primaries and elections, further providing for publishing constitutional amendments.
Title
In the Secretary of the Commonwealth, further providing for powers and duties of the Secretary of the Commonwealth and for explanation of ballot question and providing for wording of ballot question; in dates of elections and primaries and special elections, further providing for elections on proposed constitutional amendments; in ballots, further providing for form of official election ballot; in voting machines, further providing for form of ballot labels on voting machines; and, in preparation for and conduct of primaries and elections, further providing for publishing constitutional amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-25 | House | Removed from table |
2022-01-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-10 | House | First consideration |
2022-01-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-04-16 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |