PA HB12 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Act No. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Act No. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preliminary provisions relating to divorce, further providing for definitions; and, in dissolution of marital status, further providing for grounds for divorce, for counseling and for decree of court.
Title
In preliminary provisions relating to divorce, further providing for definitions; and, in dissolution of marital status, further providing for grounds for divorce, for counseling and for decree of court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 12 PN 2472, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - House - House Floor: HB 12 PN 2472, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Floor: HB 12 PN 2404, 2015 A3685, SCHLOSSBERG (Y: 186 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Floor: HB 12 PN 2404, 2015 A3850, SCHLOSSBERG (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03664 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03664 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - House - House Floor: HB 12 PN 2472, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Floor: HB 12 PN 2404, 2015 A3685, SCHLOSSBERG (Y: 186 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Floor: HB 12 PN 2404, 2015 A3850, SCHLOSSBERG (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03664 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03664 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Act No. 24 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-11-13 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-11-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-11-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2015-11-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-10-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-10-28 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-20 | House | First consideration |
2015-10-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |