PA HB1196 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-18 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-18 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, further providing for definitions, for administration and enforcement and for exemptions; and providing for applicability.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for administration and enforcement and for exemptions; and providing for applicability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-14 - Senate - HB 1196 PN 4475, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-15 - House - HB 1196 PN 2984, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-08 - House - HB 1196 PN 1424, 2009 A4496, BAKER (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-15 - House - HB 1196 PN 2984, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-08 - House - HB 1196 PN 1424, 2009 A4496, BAKER (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-18 | Referred to RULES | |
2010-10-14 | In the House | |
2010-10-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-10-13 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-10-12 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-10-12 | Second consideration | |
2010-10-12 | Removed from table | |
2010-05-26 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-13 | First consideration | |
2010-04-13 | Reported as amended | |
2009-12-15 | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY | |
2009-12-15 | In the Senate | |
2009-12-15 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-12-08 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2009-12-08 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-11-09 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-11-09 | Removed from table | |
2009-10-09 | Laid on the table | |
2009-10-09 | First consideration | |
2009-10-09 | Reported as committed | |
2009-04-03 | Referred to LABOR RELATIONS |