PA HB1188 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking, further providing for unlawful devices and methods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In hunting and furtaking, further providing for unlawful devices and methods.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1188 PN 1385, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1188 PN 1385, FP (Y: 195 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01SenateAct No. 41
2020-07-01SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-06-24SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-06-24SenateSigned in Senate
2020-06-24SenateSigned in House
2020-06-23SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-1)
2020-06-22SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-08SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-08SenateSecond consideration
2020-05-27SenateFirst consideration
2020-05-27SenateReported as committed
2019-06-21SenateReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES
2019-06-19SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-5)
2019-06-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-18HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-17HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-14HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-14HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-14HouseReported as committed
2019-04-11HouseReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1188
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1188&pn=1385
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=18&theDate=05/14/2019&RollCallId=528
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=498
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/19/2019&RollCallId=844
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=11&theDate=05/27/2020&RollCallId=894
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/22/2020&RollCallId=976
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=544

Bill Comments

feedback