PA HB1179 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-21 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-21 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in district election officers, further providing for qualifications of election officers and for vacancies in election boards.
Title
In district election officers, further providing for qualifications of election officers and for vacancies in election boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1179 PN 1524, 2015 A8377, COHEN (Y: 76 N: 111 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2016-06-14 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Insurance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Insurance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Insurance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Insurance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-09-21 | House | Second consideration |
2016-09-20 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-06-29 | House | Re-referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-29 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |