PA HB1177 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-24 - Act No. 131
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-24 - Act No. 131
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for appeal of decision by school reform commission; further providing for initiative of electors seeking consolidation or merger with new home rule charter and for investment of authority funds; and providing for local option cigarette tax in school districts of the first class and for local sales tax revenues in cities of the first class.
Title
Providing for appeal of decision by school reform commission; further providing for initiative of electors seeking consolidation or merger with new home rule charter and for investment of authority funds; and providing for local option cigarette tax in school districts of the first class and for local sales tax revenues in cities of the first class.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-23 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-08 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - House - HB 1177 PN 2063, FP (Y: 195 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - House - HB 1177 PN 1958, 2013 A2135, HENNESSEY (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-08 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - House - HB 1177 PN 2063, FP (Y: 195 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - House - HB 1177 PN 1958, 2013 A2135, HENNESSEY (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-24 | Senate | Act No. 131 |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments (39-11) |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-09-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-09-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (114-84) |
2014-09-16 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2014-07-09 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-07-08 | House | In the House |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments, as amended by the Senate (43-5) |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-07-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-07-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (119-80) |
2014-07-02 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2014-07-01 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-07-01 | House | In the House |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (38-12) |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Removed from table |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-06-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-2) |
2013-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-17 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-06-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-05 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-05 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |