PA HB1169 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-28 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-28 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in consolidated county assessment, further providing for definitions, for changes in assessed valuation and for abstracts of building and demolition permits to be forwarded to the county assessment office.
Title
In consolidated county assessment, further providing for definitions, for changes in assessed valuation and for abstracts of building and demolition permits to be forwarded to the county assessment office.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Jerome Knowles [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
Rep. Christina Sappey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1169 PN 1449, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00902 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1169 PN 1449, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00902 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-05-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-05-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-05-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-25 | House | Second consideration |
2021-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-05 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |