PA HB1140 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-22 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-22 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of aggravated assault.
Title
In assault, further providing for the offense of aggravated assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-15 - House - HB 1140 PN 1242, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-22 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2011-11-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-11-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2011-11-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-11-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-11-14 | House | Second consideration |
2011-11-02 | House | Removed from table |
2011-09-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-09-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-21 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2011-06-21 | House | First consideration |
2011-06-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-03-21 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |