PA HB1124 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of neglect of care-dependent person and providing for the offense of abuse of care-dependent person.
Title
In assault, further providing for the offense of neglect of care-dependent person and providing for the offense of abuse of care-dependent person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1124 PN 3730, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1124 PN 3730, CONCUR (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1124 PN 2809, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1124 PN 1648, 2017 A3582, STEPHENS (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-09-26 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1124 PN 3730, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1124 PN 3730, CONCUR (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1124 PN 2809, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1124 PN 1648, 2017 A3582, STEPHENS (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-09-26 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | House | Act No. 53 |
2018-06-28 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-22 | House | Signed in House |
2018-06-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (193-0) |
2018-06-22 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-06-22 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-06-22 | House | In the House |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-12-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-12-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2017-12-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-12-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-12-11 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-12-04 | House | Removed from table |
2017-11-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-11-27 | House | Removed from table |
2017-09-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-26 | House | First consideration |
2017-09-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |