PA HB1123 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 22, 1978 (P.L.1166, No.274), referred to as the Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency Law, further providing for definitions and for powers and duties of the commission; and establishing the Constable William Davidson Reward Fund.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for powers and duties of the commission; and establishing the Constable William Davidson Reward Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1123 PN 3049, FP (Y: 187 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1123 PN 3030, 2021 A4128 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1123 PN 1171, 2021 A3996 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1123 PN 3049, FP (Y: 187 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1123 PN 3030, 2021 A4128 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1123 PN 1171, 2021 A3996 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2022-04-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | Final passage (187-16) |
2022-04-26 | House | Third consideration, with amendments |
2022-04-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-04-13 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-12 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |