PA HB1122 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on January 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-26 - Act No. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Game Commission, further providing for organization of commission; and, in hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for resident license and fee exemptions and for license costs and fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Pennsylvania Game Commission, further providing for organization of commission; and, in hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for resident license and fee exemptions and for license costs and fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1122 PN 2657, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1122 PN 2657, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1122 PN 1170, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-26HouseAct No. 3
2022-01-26HouseApproved by the Governor
2022-01-26HousePresented to the Governor
2022-01-26HouseSigned in Senate
2022-01-26HouseSigned in House
2022-01-26HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
2022-01-26HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2022-01-26HouseReferred to RULES
2022-01-25HouseIn the House
2022-01-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2022-01-25SenateAmended on third consideration
2022-01-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-10-26SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-10-26SenateSecond consideration
2021-10-19SenateFirst consideration
2021-10-19SenateReported as committed
2021-05-28SenateReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES
2021-05-26SenateIn the Senate
2021-05-26HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-05-26HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-05-25HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-25HouseSecond consideration
2021-05-24HouseRemoved from table
2021-04-21HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-21HouseFirst consideration
2021-04-21HouseReported as committed
2021-04-07HouseReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1122
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1122&pn=1170
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1122&pn=2657
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1122P1170.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB1122P1170.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1122P2657.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=18&theDate=04/21/2021&RollCallId=346
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=249
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/26/2021&RollCallId=509
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=11&theDate=10/19/2021&RollCallId=560
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=437
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=01/26/2022&RollCallId=1288
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=740

Bill Comments

feedback