PA HB1118 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in provisions relating to the Secretary of the Commonwealth, further providing for powers and duties of the Secretary of the Commonwealth and for explanation of ballot question; and, in ballots, further providing for form of official election ballot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In provisions relating to the Secretary of the Commonwealth, further providing for powers and duties of the Secretary of the Commonwealth and for explanation of ballot question; and, in ballots, further providing for form of official election ballot.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-13HouseLaid on the table
2021-12-13HouseRemoved from table
2021-09-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-09-27HouseFirst consideration
2021-09-27HouseReported as committed
2021-04-07HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback