PA HB1104 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 27 (Environmental Resources) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preliminary provisions, providing for Abandoned Manufacturing Sites Registry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, providing for Abandoned Manufacturing Sites Registry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1104 PN 2578, FP (Y: 197 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1104 PN 1597, 2019 A2723, TOOHIL (Y: 176 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-08SenateReferred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
2019-09-25SenateIn the Senate
2019-09-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-2)
2019-09-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-09-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-09-24HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-09-19HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-18HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-18HouseReported as committed
2019-04-29HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1104
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1104&pn=1597
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1104&pn=2578
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=800
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=668
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=679
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/25/2019&RollCallId=1131

Bill Comments

feedback