PA HB1092 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in commercial drivers, further providing for disqualification.
Title
In commercial drivers, further providing for disqualification.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D] | Rep. Maureen Madden [D] | Rep. Ben Sanchez [D] | Rep. Michael Schlossberg [D] |
Rep. David Delloso [D] | Rep. Joseph Webster [D] | Rep. Roni Green [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1092 PN 1536, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 155 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1092 PN 1140, 2023 A876 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1092 PN 1536, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 155 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1092 PN 1140, 2023 A876 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2023-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (155-48) |
2023-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-12 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2023-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2023-05-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-05-22 | House | First consideration |
2023-05-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-05-03 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |