PA HB109 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on July 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-14 - Act No. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on July 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-14 - Act No. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act authorizing Lower Merion Township, Montgomery County, to sell and convey certain Project 70 lands free of restrictions imposed by the Project 70 Land Acquisition and Borrowing Act, in return for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on other land to be acquired by the township; authorizing the City of Warren, Warren County, to sell and convey certain Project 70 lands free of restrictions imposed by the Project 70 Land Acquisition and Borrowing Act; authorizing the City of Wilkes-Barre, Luzerne County, to convey a fee interest in certain Project 70 lands free of restrictions imposed under the Project 70 Land Acquisition and Borrowing Act; and authorizing the Borough of Old Forge, Lackawanna County, to transfer, sell and convey certain Project 70 lands free of restrictions imposed by the Project 70 Land Acquisition and Borrowing Act.
Title
Authorizing Lower Merion Township, Montgomery County, to sell and convey certain Project 70 lands free of restrictions imposed by the Project 70 Land Acquisition and Borrowing Act, in return for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on other land to be acquired by the township; authorizing the City of Warren, Warren County, to sell and convey certain Project 70 lands free of restrictions imposed by the Project 70 Land Acquisition and Borrowing Act; authorizing the City of Wilkes-Barre, Luzerne County, to convey a fee interest in certain Project 70 lands free of restrictions imposed under the Project 70 Land Acquisition and Borrowing Act; and authorizing the Borough of Old Forge, Lackawanna County, to transfer, sell and convey certain Project 70 lands free of restrictions imposed by the Project 70 Land Acquisition and Borrowing Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-13 - House - HB 109 PN 2417, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-09 - Senate - HB 109 PN 2417, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-16 - House - HB 109 PN 913, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-09 - Senate - HB 109 PN 2417, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-16 - House - HB 109 PN 913, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-14 | Act No. 16 | |
2009-07-14 | Approved by the Governor | |
2009-07-14 | Presented to the Governor | |
2009-07-14 | Signed in Senate | |
2009-07-13 | Signed in House | |
2009-07-13 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2009-07-13 | Reported as committed | |
2009-07-13 | Referred to RULES | |
2009-07-09 | In the House | |
2009-07-09 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-07-08 | Amended on third consideration | |
2009-07-07 | Second consideration | |
2009-07-02 | First consideration | |
2009-07-02 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2009-03-16 | In the Senate | |
2009-03-16 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-03-11 | Second consideration | |
2009-03-09 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-02-04 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-02-04 | Removed from table | |
2009-02-03 | Laid on the table | |
2009-02-03 | First consideration | |
2009-02-03 | Reported as amended | |
2009-01-28 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |