PA HB1084 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-04-09 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-04-09 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Summary
An Act amending the act of January 30, 1974 (P.L.13, No.6), referred to as the Loan Interest and Protection Law, defining "department"; and further providing for the definition of "residential mortgage" and for the duties of the Department of Banking.
Title
An Act amending the act of January 30, 1974 (P.L.13, No.6), referred to as the Loan Interest and Protection Law, defining "department"; and further providing for the definition of "residential mortgage" and for the duties of the Department of Banking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-09 | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE | |
2008-04-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-04-07 | Second consideration | |
2008-04-07 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-02-13 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-02-13 | Removed from table | |
2008-02-12 | Laid on the table | |
2008-02-12 | First consideration | |
2008-02-12 | Reported as committed | |
2007-04-18 | Referred to COMMERCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1084 |