PA HB1080 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of April 20, 1927 (P.L.311, No.177), entitled "An act providing for a more equitable method of assessing capital stock tax against corporations, limited partnerships, joint stock associations, and companies, in certain cases."
Title
Repealing the act of April 20, 1927 (P.L.311, No.177), entitled "An act providing for a more equitable method of assessing capital stock tax against corporations, limited partnerships, joint stock associations, and companies, in certain cases."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1080 PN 1254, FP (Y: 189 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2019-05-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-1) |
2019-05-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-30 | House | Second consideration |
2019-04-29 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-17 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to FINANCE |