PA HB108 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-16 - Act No. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-16 - Act No. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, further providing for definitions, for children's health care and for expiration.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for children's health care and for expiration.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Micozzie [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Ed Neilson [D] | Rep. David Maloney [R] |
Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D] | Rep. Florindo Fabrizio [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-10-15 - House - HB 108 PN 2370, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-09-25 - Senate - HB 108 PN 2370, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-23 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - HB 108 PN 99, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-25 - Senate - HB 108 PN 2370, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-23 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - HB 108 PN 99, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-16 | House | Act No. 74 |
2013-10-16 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2013-10-16 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2013-10-15 | House | Signed in Senate |
2013-10-15 | House | Signed in House |
2013-10-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (200-0) |
2013-10-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2013-09-25 | House | Referred to RULES |
2013-09-25 | House | In the House |
2013-09-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-09-23 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2013-02-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-02-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2013-02-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-02-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-02-04 | House | Second consideration |
2013-01-23 | House | Removed from table |
2013-01-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-01-23 | House | First consideration |
2013-01-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |