PA HB1059 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 108 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 108 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for declarations of estimated tax; in realty transfer tax, further providing for transfer of tax;
Title
In personal income tax, further providing for declarations of estimated tax; in realty transfer tax, further providing for transfer of tax;
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-26 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1059 PN 3613, CONCURRENCE (Y: 139 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1059 PN 3613, MOTION TO TABLE (Y: 76 N: 122 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05857 (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1059 PN 3613, Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1059 PN 3613, 2021 A5880, Motion to Table MUTH Amendment No. A-5880 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1059 PN 3613, 2021 A5878, Motion to Table MUTH Amendment No. A-5878 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1059 PN 3613, 2021 A5877, Motion to Table MUTH Amendment No. A-5877 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1059 PN 3613, 2021 A5879, Motion to Table MUTH Amendment No. A-5879 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt Amendment A05518 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1059 PN 2658, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1059 PN 1630, 2021 A2855 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01164 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1059 PN 3613, CONCURRENCE (Y: 139 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1059 PN 3613, MOTION TO TABLE (Y: 76 N: 122 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05857 (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1059 PN 3613, Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1059 PN 3613, 2021 A5880, Motion to Table MUTH Amendment No. A-5880 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1059 PN 3613, 2021 A5878, Motion to Table MUTH Amendment No. A-5878 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1059 PN 3613, 2021 A5877, Motion to Table MUTH Amendment No. A-5877 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1059 PN 3613, 2021 A5879, Motion to Table MUTH Amendment No. A-5879 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt Amendment A05518 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1059 PN 2658, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1059 PN 1630, 2021 A2855 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01164 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | House | Act No. 108 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2022-10-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (139-59) |
2022-10-26 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-10-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-10-26 | House | In the House |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (41-8) |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2022-01-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-01-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2022-01-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-01-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-01-24 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-21 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-26 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-03-31 | House | Referred to FINANCE |