PA HB1058 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-14 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in juvenile matters, further providing for definitions and for notice and hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In juvenile matters, further providing for definitions and for notice and hearing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-11-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1058 PN 1471, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A00834 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Children And Youth: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-14SenateRe-reported as committed
2023-09-20SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2023-09-20SenateSecond consideration
2023-09-19SenateFirst consideration
2023-09-19SenateReported as committed
2023-06-30SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH
2023-06-22SenateIn the Senate
2023-06-22HouseThird consideration and final passage (203-0)
2023-06-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2023-06-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2023-06-21HouseSecond consideration
2023-06-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2023-06-07HouseRe-committed to RULES
2023-06-07HouseFirst consideration
2023-06-07HouseReported as amended
2023-04-28HouseReferred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1058
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1058&pn=1072
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1058&pn=1471
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/HB1058P1471.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2023/0/HB1058P1471.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=06/07/2023&RollCallId=341
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=06/07/2023&RollCallId=342
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=06/07/2023&RollCallId=343
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=67&theDate=06/21/2023&RollCallId=511
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=314
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=62&theDate=06/22/2023&RollCallId=550
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=1&theDate=09/19/2023&RollCallId=477
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=11/14/2023&RollCallId=646

Bill Comments

feedback