PA HB1052 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Passed on December 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-22 - Act No. 128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Passed on December 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-22 - Act No. 128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act establishing an independent informal dispute resolution process for long-term care nursing facilities to dispute Department of Health survey deficiencies; and providing for the powers and duties of the Department of Health.
Title
Establishing an independent informal dispute resolution process for long-term care nursing facilities to dispute Department of Health survey deficiencies; and providing for the powers and duties of the Department of Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - House - HB 1052 PN 2822, CONCUR (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - Senate - HB 1052 PN 2822, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-12 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-06 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-26 - House - HB 1052 PN 2588, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - Senate - HB 1052 PN 2822, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-12 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-06 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-26 - House - HB 1052 PN 2588, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-22 | House | Act No. 128 |
2011-12-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2011-12-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2011-12-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2011-12-15 | House | Signed in House |
2011-12-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (191-0) |
2011-12-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2011-12-14 | House | Referred to RULES |
2011-12-14 | House | In the House |
2011-12-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-12-12 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2011-12-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-12-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-12-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-10-31 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2011-10-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-10-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2011-10-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-10-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-10-25 | House | Second consideration |
2011-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2011-10-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-10-19 | House | First consideration |
2011-10-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-03-14 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |