PA HB105 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-26 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-26 - House - House Floor: HB 105 PN 2611, 2021 A3507 (Y: 89 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-11 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2022-01-26HouseSecond consideration
2022-01-14HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2611
2022-01-12HouseRemoved from table
2022-01-11HouseLaid on the table
2022-01-11HouseFirst consideration
2022-01-11HouseReported as committed
2021-04-07HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback