PA HB1024 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-15 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of October 7, 2010 (P.L.484, No.70), known as the Adult Protective Services Act, in reporting suspected abuse by employees, providing for Statewide adult abuse registry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In reporting suspected abuse by employees, providing for Statewide adult abuse registry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-03 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A03448 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-15HouseRemoved from table
2018-10-15HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-19HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-19HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-17HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-17HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-12HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-12HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-16HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-03HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-03HouseFirst consideration
2017-10-03HouseReported as amended
2017-05-10HouseRe-referred to HUMAN SERVICES
2017-05-10HouseReported with request to re-refer to HUMAN SERVICES
2017-03-30HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1024
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1024&pn=1183
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1024&pn=2518
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=395
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=10/03/2017&RollCallId=945
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=10/03/2017&RollCallId=944

Bill Comments

feedback