PA HB1019 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-14-2)
Status: Passed on December 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-21 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 9 (Burial Grounds) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions relating to burial grounds, further providing for definitions; and providing for transfer of ownership of cemeteries and for reasonable access to burial grounds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions relating to burial grounds, further providing for definitions; and providing for transfer of ownership of cemeteries and for reasonable access to burial grounds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1019 PN 2209, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1019 PN 2202, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1019 PN 2202, 2017 A2741, GILLEN (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1019 PN 2164, 2017 A2558, FREEMAN (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1019 PN 2164, 2017 A2556, FREEMAN (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1019 PN 2164, 2017 A2500, ROTHMAN (Y: 194 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1019 PN 2164, 2017 A2482, ROTHMAN (Y: 189 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A02387 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-21SenateAct No. 64
2017-12-21SenateApproved by the Governor
2017-12-11SenatePresented to the Governor
2017-12-11SenateSigned in Senate
2017-11-20SenateSigned in House
2017-11-15SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-11-14SenateSecond consideration
2017-10-17SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-17SenateReported as committed
2017-07-14SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2017-07-07SenateIn the Senate
2017-07-07HouseFinal passage (190-0)
2017-07-07HouseThird consideration, with amendments
2017-07-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-30HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-06-30HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-28HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-28HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-28HouseReported as amended
2017-03-30HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1019
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1019&pn=1182
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1019&pn=2164
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1019&pn=2202
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1019&pn=2209
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=06/28/2017&RollCallId=794
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=06/28/2017&RollCallId=795
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=607
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=608
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=609
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=610
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/30/2017&RollCallId=833
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=624
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=625
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=07/07/2017&RollCallId=838
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=10/17/2017&RollCallId=484
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=348

Bill Comments

feedback