PA HB1013 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in quality health care accountability and protection, further providing for emergency services and providing for quality eye care for insured Pennsylvanians.
Title
In quality health care accountability and protection, further providing for emergency services and providing for quality eye care for insured Pennsylvanians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A09523 (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1013 PN 4069, CONCUR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1013 PN 4069, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1013 PN 1709, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01180 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended A01180 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1013 PN 4069, CONCUR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1013 PN 4069, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1013 PN 1709, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01180 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended A01180 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Act No. 103 |
2018-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (187-0) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-10-16 | House | In the House |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-09-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2017-05-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2017-05-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-23 | House | Second consideration |
2017-05-22 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-10 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |