PA HB1012 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, further providing for medical assistance payments for institutional care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public assistance, further providing for medical assistance payments for institutional care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1012 PN 1051, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2021-06-08SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (203-0)
2021-06-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-05-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-04HouseSecond consideration
2021-04-20HouseRemoved from table
2021-04-06HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-06HouseFirst consideration
2021-04-06HouseReported as committed
2021-03-25HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback