OR SCR8 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-03 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Adjourning organizational session of Seventy-sixth Legislative Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adjourning organizational session of Seventy-sixth Legislative Assembly.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-03 Filed With Secretary of State.
2011-02-02 Co-Speakers signed.
2011-02-02 President signed.
2011-01-11 Read. Carried by Hunt. Adopted. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Bailey, Clem, Cowan, Smith G., Whisnant.
2011-01-11 First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers.
2011-01-10 Under the provisions of the Report of the Committee on Permanent Organization and Order of Business, placed for final reading. Carred by Burdick. On Adoption of the Resolution the vote was: Ayes, 20; nays, 10--Atkinson, Boquist, Ferrioli, George, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Telfer, Thomsen, Whitsett.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback