OR SCR5 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring last week in April of each year to be Oregon Dance Week.
Title
Declaring last week in April of each year to be Oregon Dance Week.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Filed With Secretary of State. | |
2011-05-04 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-03 | President signed. | |
2011-04-29 | Read. Carried by Garrett,Freeman. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Gilliam, Lindsay; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Cowan, Jenson. | |
2011-04-28 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 29, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-28 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 29, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-27 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 28, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-26 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-04-25 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-04-07 | Final reading. Carried by Bonamici. Adopted. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Girod. | |
2011-04-07 | Made a Special Order of Business by voice vote. | |
2011-04-06 | Taken from 04-06 Calendar and placed on 04-07 Calendar on voice vote. | |
2011-04-05 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-04 | Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-03-31 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |