OR SCR4 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring achievements of Dr. William C. "Bud" Pierce and his wife, Dr. Selma Pierce.
Title
Honoring achievements of Dr. William C. "Bud" Pierce and his wife, Dr. Selma Pierce.
Sponsors
Rep. Vicki Berger [R] | Rep. Kevin Cameron [R] | Sen. Peter Courtney [D] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] |
Sen. Jackie Winters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Filed With Secretary of State. | |
2011-05-10 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-06 | President signed. | |
2011-05-03 | Read. Carried by Berger. Adopted. Ayes, 60. | |
2011-05-03 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 3, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-28 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-04-25 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Health Care. | |
2011-02-16 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-02-15 | Final reading. Carried by President Courtney, Winters. Adopted. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-02-15 | Made a Special Order of Business by voice vote. | |
2011-02-10 | Taken from 02-10 Calendar and placed on 02-15 Calendar on voice vote. | |
2011-02-08 | Second reading. | |
2011-02-08 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-02-02 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Health Care, Human Services and Rural Health Policy. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |