OR SCR210 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memoriam: Jeannette Hamby, 1933-2012.
Title
In memoriam: Jeannette Hamby, 1933-2012.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Filed With Secretary of State. | |
2012-03-01 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-29 | President signed. | |
2012-02-28 | Read. Carried by Doherty, Kennemer. Adopted. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-02-28 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 28, 2012 Calendar. | |
2012-02-27 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2012-02-27 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-24 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-24 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-24 | Final reading. Carried by Ferrioli, Burdick. Adopted. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-02-24 | Made a Special Order of Business by voice vote. | |
2012-02-23 | Taken from 02-23 Calendar and placed on 02-24 Calendar on voice vote. | |
2012-02-22 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-22 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2012-02-21 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-16 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |