OR SCR204 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes deadlines for presession-filed legislative measures for 2023 regular session of Eighty-second Legislative Assembly. Establishes deadlines for presession-filed legislative measures for 2023 regular session of Eighty-second Legislative Assembly.
Title
Establishing deadlines for presession-filed legislative measures for 2023 regular session of Eighty-second Legislative Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Read. Carried by Fahey. Adopted. Ayes, 36; Nays, 20--Bonham, Cate, George, Goodwin, Hayden, Hieb, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Owens, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wilde, Wright, Zika; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Prusak, Scharf. |
2022-03-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Final reading. Carried by Wagner. Adopted. Ayes, 26; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |